EP4079753 - T-CELL RECEPTORS SPECIFIC FOR BOTH RAC1- AND RAC2-DERIVED MUTATED EPITOPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Delbrück-Centrum für Molekulare Medizin in der Helmholtz-Gemeinschaft Robert-Rössle-Straße 10 13125 Berlin / DE | For all designated states Charité - Universitätsmedizin Berlin Charitéplatz 1 10117 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | For all designated states Max-Delbrück-Centrum für Molekulare Medizin in der Helmholtz-Gemeinschaft Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10 13125 Berlin / DE | ||
For all designated states Charité - Universitätsmedizin Berlin Charitéplatz 1 10117 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLANKENSTEIN, Thomas Berlin / DE | 02 /
WILLIMSKY, Gerald Berlin / DE | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Kuttenkeuler, David SKM-IP PartGmbB Oberanger 45 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | Kuttenkeuler, David Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21169356.9 | 20.04.2021 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4079753 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, A61K35/17, A61P35/00, C07K14/725, C12N5/0783 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
C07K14/7051 (EP);
A61K2239/38 (EP,US);
A61K2239/57 (EP,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/4632 (EP,US);
A61K39/464464 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | T-ZELL-REZEPTOREN SPEZIFISCH FÜR SOWOHL RAC1- ALS AUCH RAC2-ABGELEITETE MUTIERTE EPITOPE | [2022/43] | English: | T-CELL RECEPTORS SPECIFIC FOR BOTH RAC1- AND RAC2-DERIVED MUTATED EPITOPES | [2022/43] | French: | RÉCEPTEURS DE LYMPHOCYTES T SPÉCIFIQUES AUX ÉPITOPES MUTÉS D'ORIGINE RAC1 ET RAC2 | [2022/43] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/42] | 24.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2014083173 (MAX DELBRÜCK CT FÜR MOLEKULARE MEDIZIN MDC BERLIN BUCH [DE]) | by applicant | US5545806 | US5569825 | US5714352 | US2002197266 |