EP3907841 - CUSTOMIZED SECONDARY POWER DISTRIBUTION ASSEMBLY GENERATED FROM CUSTOMIZABLE SECONDARY POWER DISTRIBUTION ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RADULESCU, Gabriel Loves Park, 61111 / US | 02 /
LEIBHAM, Terrence R. Galena, IL, 61063 / US | [2021/45] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 21169493.0 | 20.04.2021 | [2021/45] | Priority number, date | US202063020173P | 05.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063020173 P | [2021/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3907841 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J1/08, H02J3/00, H02J4/00, B64D41/00 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
B64D41/00 (EP);
H02J13/00016 (US);
B64D31/00 (US);
H02J1/084 (EP);
H02J3/007 (EP);
H02J4/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/23] |
Former [2021/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUNDENSPEZIFISCHE SEKUNDÄRE ENERGIEVERTEILUNGSANORDNUNG, DIE AUS EINER KUNDENSPEZIFISCHEN SEKUNDÄREN ENERGIEVERTEILUNGSANORDNUNG ERZEUGT WIRD | [2021/45] | English: | CUSTOMIZED SECONDARY POWER DISTRIBUTION ASSEMBLY GENERATED FROM CUSTOMIZABLE SECONDARY POWER DISTRIBUTION ASSEMBLY | [2021/45] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE DISTRIBUTION DE PUISSANCE SECONDAIRE PERSONNALISÉ GÉNÉRÉ À PARTIR D'UN ENSEMBLE DE DISTRIBUTION DE PUISSANCE SECONDAIRE PERSONNALISABLE | [2021/45] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/23] | 04.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6470224 (DRAKE PAUL R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 2 * * claims 1-4 ** column 2, line 55 - column 6, line 62 *; | [XI]US2014001887 (RAMAMURTHY SHANKAR [US], et al) [X] 1,10-14 * abstract * * figures 1,4,5,6a,6b,7a,7b,8,9,10-12,15,16a,16b,18 * * claims 1-3,6-9,10-14,17-19 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0010] , [0039] - [0046] - [0048] - [0049] - [0052] - [0055] - [0057] * * paragraphs [0063] - [0064] - [0075] , [0079] , [0080] - [0082] - [0084] , [0087] * [I] 2-9,15 |