Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3968157 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3968157



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(32)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 216
16.01.2025 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
16.01.2025 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.01.2025 Examination started Search / examination 1
28.03.2024 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.03.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.03.2024 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
14.03.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.08.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.08.2022 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
18.08.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
18.08.2022 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
18.08.2022 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
18.08.2022 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
18.08.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
21.03.2022 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
16.02.2022 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.10.2021 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.10.2021 European search opinion Search / examination 4
22.10.2021 European search report Search / examination 2
22.10.2021 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
20.10.2021 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.10.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.10.2021 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
04.05.2021 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
23.04.2021 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 90
21.04.2021 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.04.2021 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
21.04.2021 Claims Search / examination 4
21.04.2021 Description Search / examination 59
21.04.2021 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.04.2021 Drawings Search / examination 7
21.04.2021 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5