EP3907660 - METHOD, APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM FOR RECOGNIZING LICENSE PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CO. LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Haidian District 100085 Beijing / CN | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NI, Zihan Beijing, 100085 / CN | 02 /
SUN, Yipeng Beijing, 100085 / CN | 03 /
HAN, Junyu Beijing, 100085 / CN | [2021/45] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21169665.3 | 21.04.2021 | [2021/45] | Priority number, date | CN202010536808 | 12.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010536808 | [2021/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3907660 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/62 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
G06N3/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06V20/625 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06V30/153 (CN);
G06F18/214 (US);
G06F18/22 (US);
G06N3/044 (EP,KR,US);
G06N3/045 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06V10/82 (EP,KR,US);
G06V20/62 (US);
G06V30/19173 (EP,KR,US);
G06T2207/20081 (KR);
G06T2207/20084 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/23] |
Former [2021/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, EINRICHTUNG, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM ZUR ERKENNUNG VON NUMMERNSCHILDERN | [2021/45] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM FOR RECOGNIZING LICENSE PLATE | [2021/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE POUR LA RECONNAISSANCE DE PLAQUE D'IMMATRICULATION | [2021/45] | Examination procedure | 01.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/23] | 01.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |