EP3926528 - IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Baidu Netcom Science and Technology Co., Ltd. 2/F Baidu Campus No.10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | For all designated states Beijing Baidu Netcom Science and Technology Co., Ltd. 2/F Baidu Campus No.10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Yuexiang Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Renyi Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
HAN, Junyu Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/51] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 21169915.2 | 22.04.2021 | [2021/51] | Priority number, date | CN202010555785 | 17.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010555785 | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3926528 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
G06V40/161 (EP);
G06V40/16 (CN,KR);
G06V10/443 (US);
G06F16/5866 (US);
G06F18/22 (CN,KR);
G06V20/40 (CN,KR);
G06V20/46 (US);
G06V40/166 (US);
G06V40/169 (US);
G06V40/172 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2021/51] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2021/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2021/51] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 02.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011212717 (RHOADS GEOFFREY B [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0420] - paragraph [0423] *; | [XI]WO2018020275 (UNIFAI HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * page 4, lines 3-18 * * page 16, lines 7-11 * * page 19, line 33 * * page 10, line 27 * * page 24, line 9 * * page 59, lines 23-27 * * page 62, lines 19-21 * * page 65, lines 19-21 * * page 81, lines 20-23 * * page 100, lines 3-6 * * figure 49 * [I] 2-6,8-15 |