EP3944132 - ACTIVE INTERACTION METHOD AND APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Baidu Netcom Science and Technology Co., Ltd. 2/F Baidu Campus No.10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | For all designated states Beijing Baidu Netcom Science and Technology Co., Ltd. 2/F Baidu Campus No.10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XUE, Yang Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Fan Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
HE, Jingzhou Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/04] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 21170233.7 | 23.04.2021 | [2022/04] | Priority number, date | CN202010700592 | 20.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010700592 | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3944132 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
G06V20/10 (EP);
G06V20/40 (KR);
G06V20/41 (CN);
G06F18/40 (US);
G06F18/2132 (US);
G06F18/2411 (CN);
G06F18/253 (CN,US);
G06F40/30 (US);
G06N20/00 (KR);
G06T7/251 (US);
G06V10/469 (KR);
G06V20/46 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR AKTIVEN INTERAKTION, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/04] | English: | ACTIVE INTERACTION METHOD AND APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'INTERACTION ACTIVE, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE | [2022/04] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 01.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/08] | 16.10.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013294642 (WANG ZHIBING [CN], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0150]; figures 1-23 *; | [I]US2020143171 (LEE JOON-YOUNG [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0190]; figures 1-11 * |