EP3922637 - MODIFIED OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR USE IN TREATMENT OF TAUOPATHIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBNETH, Andreas 2300 Turnhout / BE | 02 /
VAN OUTRYVE D'YDEWALLE, Constantin 3020 Herent / BE | 03 /
GRYAZNOV, Sergei San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 04 /
MARTÍNEZ MONTERO, Saúl San Bruno, CA 94066 / US | [2021/50] | Representative(s) | Snaith, James Michael Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | Quaghebeur, Luc Johnson & Johnson Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Application number, filing date | 21170299.8 | 13.03.2019 | [2021/50] | Priority number, date | US201862642499P | 13.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862642499 P | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3922637 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/00, C12N15/113, A61K31/7088, A61P25/28 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
C07H21/00 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N15/113 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/7125 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P25/28 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/321 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/322 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2310/3341 (US);
C12N2310/335 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2310/341 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2310/345 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2310/346 (US);
C12N2310/3521 (IL);
C12N2310/3525 (IL);
C12N2320/50 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (EP);
C12N2310/322, C12N2310/3525 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Extension states | BA | 23.04.2021 | ME | 23.04.2021 | Validation states | KH | 23.04.2021 | MA | 23.04.2021 | MD | 23.04.2021 | TN | 23.04.2021 | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE OLIGONUKLEOTIDE ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON TAUOPATHIEN | [2021/50] | English: | MODIFIED OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR USE IN TREATMENT OF TAUOPATHIES | [2021/50] | French: | OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES MODIFIÉS POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE TAUOPATHIES | [2021/50] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 08.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19712535.4 / EP3765476 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 12.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 12.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.09.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 12.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 12.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.09.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO0118015 (GERON CORP [US], et al) [YD] 1-33 * abstract * * page 3, line 16 - page 5, line 14 *; | [Y]US2014121261 (GRYAZNOV SERGEI M [US], et al) [Y] 1-33 * abstract * * [0106]-[0108] *; | [XY]WO2015010135 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,11-17,19-22,26-33 * the whole document * * SEQ ID NO: 124; pages 57, 70 * * SEQ ID NO: 1768; page 109 * * SEQ ID NO: 2136; page 119 * * tables 9-66 * * pages 22-26; compounds Ia, IIa, IIIa, IVa, Va * * page 35, lines 5-20 * [Y] 3,8-10,18,23-25; | [Y]WO2016126995 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-33 * abstract * * [0166], [0246]-[0251], [0314]-[0347] * * figures 2, 3, 6, 7, 16 and 20 *; | [Y]WO2017109679 (NOVARTIS AG [CH]) [Y] 1-33 * abstract * * [0005]-[0011], [0027], [0030]-[0031], [0036], [0065]-[0078], [0083] *; | [Y] - KRISZTINA PONGRACZ ET AL, "Novel Short Oligonucleotide Conjugates as Inhibitors of Human Telomerase", NUCLEOSIDES, NUCLEOTIDES AND NUCLEIC ACIDS., US, (20031001), vol. 22, no. 5-8, doi:10.1081/NCN-120023085, ISSN 1525-7770, pages 1627 - 1629, XP055434021 [Y] 1-33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1081/NCN-120023085 | [Y] - LOUIS P. CONWAY ET AL, "The synthesis, conformation and hydrolytic stability of an N,S-bridging thiophosphoramidate analogue of thymidylyl-3',5'-thymidine", ORGANIC & BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY, (20160101), vol. 14, no. 30, doi:10.1039/C6OB01270A, ISSN 1477-0520, pages 7361 - 7367, XP055606690 [Y] 1-33 * the whole document * * compound 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C6OB01270A | [Y] - R. SCHULTZ ET AL, "Oligo-2'-fluoro-2'-deoxynucleotide N3'-->P5' phosphoramidates: synthesis and properties", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (19960801), vol. 24, no. 15, doi:10.1093/nar/24.15.2966, pages 2966 - 2973, XP055626548 [Y] 1-33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/24.15.2966 | by applicant | US6268490 | US6525191 | US6770748 | US6794499 | US7034133 | US7053207 | US7084125 | US7217805 | US7314923 | US7569575 | US7696345 | - DEVOS et al., "miRNA mimics or inhibitors, aptamers, steric blockers, saRNA, shRNA, and/or immunomodulatory oligonucleotides", Sci Transl Med, (20170125), vol. 9, no. 374 | - HANGER et al., Trends Mol Med, (20090000), vol. 15, pages 112 - 9 | - WISCHIK et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA., (19880000), vol. 85, pages 4884 - 8 | - MORRIS et al., Neuron, (20110000), vol. 70, pages 410 - 26 | - Nucleic Acids Research, (19950000), vol. 23, no. 14, pages 2661 - 2668 | - Nucleic Acids Research, (19960000), vol. 24, no. 15, pages 2966 - 2973 |