EP4079494 - USE OF POLYMETHYLPENTENE FILM AS RELEASE FILM IN A METHOD FOR SHAPING COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay SA rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Brussels / BE | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOFFIN, Anne-Lise 7804 Rebaix / BE | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Roussel, Sandrine Specialty Operations France Intellectual Assets Management 52, rue de la Haie Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | Roussel, Sandrine Rhodia Opérations Intellectual Assets Management 52 rue de la Haie Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 21170320.2 | 23.04.2021 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4079494 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/54, B29C33/68, B29C37/00 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B29C70/542 (EP,US);
B29C33/58 (EP,US);
B29C33/68 (EP,US);
B29C37/0075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] |
Former [2022/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON POLYMETHYLPENTENFILM ALS TRENNFOLIE IN EINEM VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG EINES VERBUNDMATERIALS | [2022/43] | English: | USE OF POLYMETHYLPENTENE FILM AS RELEASE FILM IN A METHOD FOR SHAPING COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2022/43] | French: | UTILISATION DE FILM DE POLYMÉTHYLPENTÈNE COMME FILM DÉTACHABLE DANS UN PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN FORME D'UN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE | [2022/43] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 26.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/41] | 24.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3042574 (JEROME HOCHBERG); | [Y]EP0017452 (STOREY BROTHERS & CO [GB]); | [Y]JP2012218257 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO) |