EP3968362 - MULTI-LAYER SUBSTRATE STRUCTURE WHICH CAN BE PEELED OFF PRECISELY AND A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Princo Corp. No. 6, Creation, 4th Rd. Hsinchu Science-Based Industrial Park Hsinchu City 30077 / TW | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiu, Pei-liang 30077 Hsinchu City / TW | 02 /
Chu, Yi-lin 30077 Hsinchu City / TW | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 21170369.9 | 26.04.2021 | [2022/11] | Priority number, date | TW20200131422 | 11.09.2020 Original published format: TW 109131422 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3968362 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/48, H01L23/498, H05K1/03, H05K3/46 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
H05K1/0393 (EP);
H05K1/03 (CN);
H05K3/007 (CN,US);
H05K3/4691 (EP);
H01L21/4857 (EP);
H01L23/49822 (EP);
H01L23/4985 (EP);
H05K2201/0154 (EP);
H05K2201/0195 (EP,CN);
H05K2201/09127 (EP);
H05K2203/0156 (US);
H05K2203/016 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRÄZISE ABZIEHBARE MEHRSCHICHTIGE SUBSTRATSTRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2022/11] | English: | MULTI-LAYER SUBSTRATE STRUCTURE WHICH CAN BE PEELED OFF PRECISELY AND A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2022/11] | French: | STRUCTURE DE SUBSTRAT MULTICOUCHE POUVANT ÊTRE RETIRÉE PRÉCISÉMENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/11] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/08] | 10.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6482490 (HANAHARA TETSURO [JP], et al) [Y] 8,15 * column 1, lines 38-40; figures 1-4 *; | [XY]US2012260501 (LI BIAO [CN]) [X] 1-4,9-11 * figures 4, 11 * [Y] 8,15; | [XY]WO2016014648 (BREWER SCIENCE INC [US]) [X] 1,10 * figure 1 * [Y] 8,15; | [XY]US2017239919 (MIYAGOE TATSUZO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-7,10,12-14 * figures 1, 2 * [Y] 8,15; | [A]WO2017190244 (LABELCRAFT PRODUCTS LTD [CA]) [A] 1-15* abstract * |