EP3912609 - MOBILITY SENSING USING LOAD CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville, IN 47006-9167 / US | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Receveur, Timothy J. Batesville 47006-9167 / US | 02 /
Embree, Stephen R. Batesville 47006-9167 / US | 03 /
Wiggermann, Neal Batesville 47006-9167 / US | 04 /
Knouse, William J. Batesville 47006-9167 / US | [2021/47] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 21170456.4 | 26.04.2021 | [2021/47] | Priority number, date | US202063017790P | 30.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063017790 P | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3912609 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3912609 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/05, G16H40/63, G16H50/30 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
A61G7/05 (EP);
A61B5/6892 (US);
A61B5/1124 (US);
A61B5/7278 (US);
A61B5/743 (US);
A61G7/0527 (US);
G16H40/63 (EP);
G16H50/30 (EP);
A61B2562/0247 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | A61G7/05 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] |
Former [2021/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MOBILITÄTSERFASSUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON KRAFTMESSZELLEN | [2021/47] | English: | MOBILITY SENSING USING LOAD CELLS | [2021/47] | French: | DÉTECTION DE MOBILITÉ À L'AIDE DE CELLULES DE CHARGE | [2021/47] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 24.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016073186 (STRYKER CORP [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0065] - [0083]; figures 1-9B * | by applicant | US10054479 | US10634549 |