EP3905866 - POWER PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR A POWER MODULE OF A TRANSPORT CLIMATE CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermo King LLC 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis, MN 55420 / US | [2023/18] |
Former [2021/44] | For all designated states Thermo King Corporation 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis, MN 55420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEMMEL, Shawn Alan Prior Lake, Minnesota, 55372 / US | 02 /
BUCKE, Diarmaid Thomas Patrickswell, V94 D9F9 / IE | 03 /
LYNCH, Niall Galway / IE | [2021/44] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2024/27] |
Former [2021/44] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 21170461.4 | 26.04.2021 | [2021/44] | Priority number, date | US202016863172 | 30.04.2020 Original published format: US202016863172 | [2021/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3905866 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3905866 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
H05K7/14322 (EP);
B60R16/03 (CN);
B60H1/00535 (US);
B60H1/00428 (US);
B60H1/00642 (US);
B60H1/3208 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/23] |
Former [2021/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSSCHUTZSYSTEM FÜR EIN LEISTUNGSMODUL EINES TRANSPORTKLIMAREGELUNGSSYSTEMS | [2021/44] | English: | POWER PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR A POWER MODULE OF A TRANSPORT CLIMATE CONTROL SYSTEM | [2021/44] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PROTECTION D'ALIMENTATION POUR UN MODULE DE PUISSANCE D'UN SYSTÈME DE RÉGULATION CLIMATIQUE DANS LE TRANSPORT | [2021/44] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/23] | 28.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2613617 (TDK CORP [JP]); | [A]US2017311457 (KUBOTA MINORU [JP], et al); | [A]WO2019131071 (AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD [JP], et al); | [A]US2020053900 (FEURTADO MATTHEW [US], et al); | [I]EP3626489 (THERMO KING CORP [US]) | Examination | US2013090009 |