EP3888628 - COSMETIC USE OF A PROBIOTIC BACTERIA LYSATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skinbiotherapeutics PLC 15 Silk House Park Green, Macclesfield SK11 7QJ / GB | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'NEILL, Catherine Manchester, M13 9PL / GB | 02 /
McBAIN, Andrew Manchester, M13 9PL / GB | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 21170549.6 | 15.03.2013 | [2021/40] | Priority number, date | GB20120006599 | 13.04.2012 Original published format: GB 201206599 | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3888628 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/99, A61P31/04, A61P17/00, A01N63/20, A61Q19/08, A61P31/00, A61K9/00, A61K35/745, A61K35/747 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
A01N63/20 (EP,US);
A61K8/99 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61K35/747 (EP,CN);
A61K35/742 (US);
A61K35/744 (RU,US);
A61K35/745 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61K9/0014 (CN);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61Q17/005 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,RU,US);
C12N1/20 (CN,RU);
| C-Set: |
A61K35/745, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K35/747, A61K2300/00 (CN) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] |
Former [2021/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE VERWENDUNG DES LYSATES EINER PROBIOTISCHE BAKTERIA | [2021/40] | English: | COSMETIC USE OF A PROBIOTIC BACTERIA LYSATE | [2021/40] | French: | UTILISATION COSMÉTIQUE D'UN LYSAT DE BACTÉRIE PROBIOTIQUE | [2021/40] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 14.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13711111.8 / EP2836223 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1609463 (OREAL [FR], et al); | [XI]FR2889057 (OREAL [FR], et al); | [XI]EP2033628 (OREAL [FR]); | [XI]WO2010013179 (OREAL [FR], et al); | [XI]EP2181703 (OREAL [FR]); | [XI]EP2226068 (OREAL [FR], et al); | [XDI]WO2011029784 (GIULIANI SPA [IT], et al); | [XI]EP2332520 (OREAL [FR], et al); | by applicant | US4839281 | US5032399 | US5837238 | US6872565 | WO2006000992 | US7517681 | EP2161329 | WO2010056198 | WO2011029784 | WO2011045471 |