Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
05.06.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
05.06.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
04.06.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | |
01.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.03.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
02.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
02.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
03.05.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.06.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
10.06.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
10.06.2022 | Change - designated states | published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
08.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
05.11.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |