EP3913403 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL ATTITUDE DETERMINATION SYSTEM WITH MULTI-FACETED INTEGRITY SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHIPPER, Brian Charlotte, 28202 / US | 02 /
BAGESHWAR, Vibhor L. Charlotte, 28202 / US | 03 /
MORTON, Blaise Charlotte, 28202 / US | [2021/47] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 21171059.5 | 28.04.2021 | [2021/47] | Priority number, date | US202016880768 | 21.05.2020 Original published format: US202016880768 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3913403 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/20, G01S19/55 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
G01S19/55 (EP,CN,US);
G01S19/20 (EP);
G01S19/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] |
Former [2021/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREIDIMENSIONALES LAGEBESTIMMUNGSSYSTEM MIT VIELSEITIGER INTEGRITÄTSLÖSUNG | [2021/47] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL ATTITUDE DETERMINATION SYSTEM WITH MULTI-FACETED INTEGRITY SOLUTION | [2021/47] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTERMINATION D'ALTITUDE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE COMPORTANT UNE SOLUTION D'INTÉGRITÉ À FACETTES MULTIPLES | [2021/47] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 07.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6166683 (HWANG PATRICK Y [US]) [X] 1* the whole document *; | [XI]US2017192103 (KUNDAK NURI [CZ], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [I] 8-10; | [XI] - Eric Broshears, "Ultra-wideband Radio Aided Carrier Phase Ambiguity Resolution in Real-Time Kinematic GPS Relative Positioning", (20130803), URL: https://etd.auburn.edu/xmlui/bitstream/handle/10415/3704/Broshears_ThesisFinal.pdf?sequence=2&isAllowed=y, (20200910), XP055729400 [X] 1-7 * page 1 - page 67 * * page 81 - page 121 * [I] 8,9 |