EP3910383 - OPTICAL FILM AND DISPLAY DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro, Giheung-Gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-Do 17113 / KR | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEON, Beong-Hun Hwaseong-si / KR | 02 /
LEE, Duk Jin Suwon-si / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Woo Suk Cheonan-si / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Dong-Wook Hwaseong-si / KR | [2021/46] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | Shearman, James Ward Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 21171462.1 | 30.04.2021 | [2021/46] | Priority number, date | KR20200056350 | 12.05.2020 Original published format: KR 20200056350 | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3910383 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/08, B32B7/12, G02B5/30, G02F1/13 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
G02B5/3008 (EP);
G02B5/3041 (KR);
H10K59/126 (CN);
H10K50/86 (US);
G02B1/08 (EP);
G02B1/115 (US);
G02B1/14 (EP,US);
G02B5/3025 (EP);
G02B5/3033 (US);
G02B5/305 (EP);
G02B5/3083 (EP,KR);
H10K59/12 (US);
H10K59/1213 (CN);
H10K59/40 (US);
H10K59/8791 (EP,CN,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] |
Former [2021/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHER FILM UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2021/46] | English: | OPTICAL FILM AND DISPLAY DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME | [2021/46] | French: | FILM OPTIQUE ET AFFICHEUR LE COMPRENANT | [2021/46] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 17.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2015011059 (KONICA MINOLTA INC); | [A]WO2015085751 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD [CN]); | [Y]WO2016080431 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]); | [XY]US2016356927 (YASUI ATSUSHI [JP], et al); | [A]KR101936157B |