EP4085946 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING A DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE, SET OF A DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE AND AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR IDENTIFYING A DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states medmix Switzerland AG Rütistrasse 7 9469 Haag (Rheintal) / CH | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gabriel, Frédéric 8052 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Lurf, Robert 8051 Zürich / CH | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 21171891.1 | 03.05.2021 | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4085946 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315, // A61M5/20, A61M5/24 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
A61M5/31568 (EP);
A61M2005/2407 (EP);
A61M2205/3306 (EP);
A61M2205/6063 (EP);
A61M2209/00 (EP);
A61M5/20 (EP);
A61M5/24 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] |
Former [2022/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINER ARZNEIMITTELABGABEVORRICHTUNG, SET EINER ARZNEIMITTELABGABEVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN EINER ARZNEIMITTELABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/45] | English: | METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING A DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE, SET OF A DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE AND AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR IDENTIFYING A DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE | [2022/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS, ENSEMBLE DE DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR IDENTIFIER UN DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS | [2022/45] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 16.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013345641 (CERMAN ZDENEK [DE], et al) [A] 1-16* figures 3-11 *; | [A]US2018369482 (PEDERSEN PER MØLGAARD [DK], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0100] - [0105] * * figures 4a-d *; | [XI]US2020330692 (SIHLANICK KEVIN [US], et al) [X] 1,15,16 * paragraphs [0056] , [0064] - [0076] * * figures 1-10 * [I] 2-14 | by applicant | WO2019011394 | WO2020015980 | EP20210167293 |