EP4087290 - CONTROL UNIT, VEHICLE COMPRISING THE CONTROL UNIT, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mourad, Alaa 80995 München / DE | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 21172039.6 | 04.05.2021 | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087290 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/24, H04L29/12, H04W4/02, H04W4/48, H04W12/50, H04W4/80, G07C9/00 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
H04W4/24 (EP);
H04W4/80 (US);
G07C9/00309 (EP);
H04L61/5038 (EP);
G07C2209/63 (EP);
H04L67/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] |
Former [2022/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUEREINHEIT, FAHRZEUG MIT DER STEUEREINHEIT, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2022/45] | English: | CONTROL UNIT, VEHICLE COMPRISING THE CONTROL UNIT, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2022/45] | French: | UNITÉ DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE, VÉHICULE COMPRENANT L'UNITÉ DE COMMANDE, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2022/45] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 17.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2017093856 (ALEXANDRU GEORGEL BOGDAN [RO], et al); | [Y]WO2017207644 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al); | [A]US2018198752 (ZHANG JINGCHENG [SE], et al); | [Y]US2021078535 (SALAH ABDEL H [US], et al); | [A]EP3796684 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) |