EP3908090 - DATA CENTER CABINET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panduit Corp. 18900 Panduit Drive Tinley Park, Illinois 60487 / US | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICEWICZ, Andrzej Westchester, 60154 / US | 02 /
WILTJER, Jerry A. Frankfort, 60423 / US | 03 /
WAZ, Tomasz K. Orland Park, 60462 / US | 04 /
FLEMING, James N. Naperville, 60540 / US | [2021/45] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2021/45] | Application number, filing date | 21172161.8 | 04.05.2021 | [2021/45] | Priority number, date | US202063019561P | 04.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063019561 P | US202117243882 | 29.04.2021 Original published format: US202117243882 | [2021/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3908090 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
H05K7/1488 (EP);
H05K7/18 (CN);
H05K5/023 (CN,US);
H05K5/0008 (US);
H05K5/0217 (CN);
H05K7/1401 (CN);
H05K7/183 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] |
Former [2021/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHRANK FÜR DATENZENTRUM | [2021/45] | English: | DATA CENTER CABINET | [2021/45] | French: | ARMOIRE DE CENTRE DE DONNÉES | [2021/45] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 10.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2006102575 (MATTLIN JEFFREY L [US], et al) [I] 14,15 * figures 1-13 * [A] 1-13; | [A]US2012018389 (FAN CHEN-LU [TW]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 ** paragraph [0016] *; | [A]US2013249363 (LIU KENG-FU [TW]) [A] 1-15 * figure 10 *; | [IA]US2020077533 (LU HSUEH-CHIN [TW], et al) [I] 14,15 * figures 1-9 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0035] * [A] 1-13 |