EP3915897 - CHILD-RESISTANT CONTAINER HAVING CAP RETAINER FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IT, SI | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/35] |
Former [2021/48] | For all designated states Henkel IP & Holding GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sterling, Daniel Peter Fairfield, 06825 / US | 02 /
Colacioppo, Keith Jon Harrison, 10528 / US | 03 /
Daoust, Michael David Sandy Hook, 06482 / US | [2021/48] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2023/13] |
Former [2021/48] | Henkel IP Department c/o Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 21172361.4 | 06.05.2021 | [2021/48] | Priority number, date | US202015929887 | 28.05.2020 Original published format: US202015929887 | [2021/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3915897 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3915897 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/04, B65D50/04, B65D55/02 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
B65D41/04 (EP,US);
B65D50/046 (EP,US);
B65D55/024 (EP);
B65D2215/02 (EP);
B65D2401/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Title | German: | KINDERSICHERER BEHÄLTER MIT KAPPENHALTERMERKMALEN | [2021/48] | English: | CHILD-RESISTANT CONTAINER HAVING CAP RETAINER FEATURES | [2021/48] | French: | RÉCIPIENT À L'ÉPREUVE DES ENFANTS DOTÉ D'ÉLÉMENTS DE RETENUE POUR LE BOUCHON | [2021/48] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 25.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.2023 | CZ | 29.03.2023 | DK | 29.03.2023 | EE | 29.03.2023 | ES | 29.03.2023 | FI | 29.03.2023 | HR | 29.03.2023 | IT | 29.03.2023 | LT | 29.03.2023 | LV | 29.03.2023 | MC | 29.03.2023 | NL | 29.03.2023 | PL | 29.03.2023 | RO | 29.03.2023 | RS | 29.03.2023 | SE | 29.03.2023 | SI | 29.03.2023 | SK | 29.03.2023 | SM | 29.03.2023 | IE | 06.05.2023 | LU | 06.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | NO | 29.06.2023 | GR | 30.06.2023 | IS | 29.07.2023 | PT | 31.07.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
IE | 06.05.2023 | ||
LU | 06.05.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
LU | 06.05.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
LU | 06.05.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 29.03.2023 | |
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 29.03.2023 | |
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 29.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2105693 (UG CLOSURES AND PLASTICS LIMIT [GB]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]US5921417 (MULL JAYNA L [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO2017200922 (PLASTEK IND INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |