EP3909732 - MACHINING CENTRE FOR CUTTING AN OBJECT IN THE FORM OF A SLAB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/46] | MACHINING CENTRE FOR CUTTING OBJECTS | ||
[2023/19] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.M.S. S.p.A. Via Locatelli, 123 24019 Zogno (BG) / IT | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOTTERLINI, Lorenzo 24030 Palazzago (BG) / IT | [2021/46] | Representative(s) | Luppi Intellectual Property S.r.l. Viale Corassori, 54 41124 Modena / IT | [2023/50] |
Former [2021/46] | Villanova, Massimo, et al Luppi Intellectual Property Srl Viale Corassori, 54 41124 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 21172426.5 | 06.05.2021 | [2021/46] | Priority number, date | IT20200010936 | 13.05.2020 Original published format: IT202000010936 | [2021/46] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909732 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3909732 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B26D9/00, B26F3/00, B28D1/00, B28D1/22, B28D1/04 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
B28D1/043 (EP);
B28D7/00 (US);
B28D1/003 (EP);
B28D1/04 (US);
B28D1/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] |
Former [2021/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BEARBEITUNGSZENTRUM ZUM SCHNEIDEN EINES OBJEKTS IN FORM EINER PLATTE | [2023/19] | English: | MACHINING CENTRE FOR CUTTING AN OBJECT IN THE FORM OF A SLAB | [2023/19] | French: | CENTRE D'USINAGE POUR DÉCOUPER UN OBJET SOUS FORME DE DALLE | [2023/19] |
Former [2021/46] | BEARBEITUNGSZENTRUM ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN | ||
Former [2021/46] | MACHINING CENTRE FOR CUTTING OBJECTS | ||
Former [2021/46] | CENTRE D'USINAGE DE DÉCOUPE D'OBJETS | Examination procedure | 24.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 31.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.2023 | CZ | 13.12.2023 | EE | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | LT | 13.12.2023 | LV | 13.12.2023 | NL | 13.12.2023 | PL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SE | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | BG | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | PT | 15.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 13.12.2023 | |
CZ | 13.12.2023 | ||
EE | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 13.12.2023 | |
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS55125417U ; | [A]US2008110311 (STANGHERLIN AMPELIO [IT]); | [A]US2014309784 (TONCELLI DARIO [IT]); | [XA]EP2998088 (BIESSE SPA [IT]); | [XA]CN110834274 (FUJIAN HUALONG MACHINERY CO LTD); | [A]CN111113684 (FOSHAN HUIGU TECH CO LTD) |