EP4085814 - WIPER PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leifheit AG Leifheitstrasse 56377 Nassau / DE | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
May, Thorsten 56379 Obernhof / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Klaus Jürgen 56379 Holzappel / DE | 03 /
Zens, Detlef 57632 Burglahr / DE | 04 /
Weber, Sylvia 55450 Langenlonsheim / DE | 05 /
Seidel, Thorsten 56410 Montabaur / DE | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | btb IP Bungartz Baltzer Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Im Mediapark 6A 50670 Köln / DE | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 21172448.9 | 06.05.2021 | [2022/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4085814 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4085814 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/258 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
A47L13/258 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | WISCHERPLATTE | [2022/45] | English: | WIPER PLATE | [2022/45] | French: | PLAQUE DE NETTOYAGE | [2022/45] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 27.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/09] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102018112821 (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0022] - [0028] *; | [A]EP3785595 (LEIFHEIT AG [DE]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0022] , [0023] * | by applicant | EP1764024 | WO2008043538 | WO2013156100 | DE102013107316 | EP2811840 | EP2868250 |