EP4086451 - DAMPING SYSTEM FOR WIND TURBINE BLADE EDGE VIBRATION STABILIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LM Wind Power A/S Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herrig, Andreas 48499 Salzbergen / DE | 02 /
Scholte-Wassink, Hartmut 48499 Salzbergen / DE | 03 /
Andalam, Satya Mohan Vamsi 560066 Bengaluru / IN | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | COPA Copenhagen Patents Rosenørns Allé 1, 2nd floor 1970 Frederiksberg C / DK | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 21172778.9 | 07.05.2021 | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4086451 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
F03D1/0675 (EP,US);
F03D1/0679 (US);
F03D7/0298 (US);
F05B2260/964 (EP,US);
F05B2270/309 (US);
F05B2270/404 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] |
Former [2022/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | 01.05.2023 | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÄMPFUNGSSYSTEM ZUR STABILISIERUNG VON VIBRATIONEN VON WINDTURBINENROTORBLATTKANTEN | [2022/45] | English: | DAMPING SYSTEM FOR WIND TURBINE BLADE EDGE VIBRATION STABILIZATION | [2022/45] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AMORTISSEMENT POUR LA STABILISATION DES VIBRATIONS DES BORDS DE PALES D'ÉOLIENNE | [2022/45] | Examination procedure | 01.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 01.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2008107540 (BONNET LAURENT [DE]); | [XI]US2020209100 (CHRISTIANSEN SOEREN [DK]) |