EP4089473 - SPECTACLE LENS DESIGN, SPECTACLE LENS KIT, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A SPECTACLE LENS AND METHOD OF PROVIDING A SPECTACLE LENS DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH Turnstrasse 27 73430 Aalen / DE | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JESTER, Philipp 89520 Heidenheim an der Brenz / DE | 02 /
HABTEGIORGIS, Selam Wondimu 73431 Aalen / DE | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | PATERIS Patentanwälte PartmbB Danckelmannstraße 9 14059 Berlin / DE | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 21173073.4 | 10.05.2021 | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4089473 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/02 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
G02C7/022 (EP);
G02B27/0018 (EP);
G02C7/028 (EP);
G02C2202/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRILLENGLASDESIGN, BRILLENGLAS-KIT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BRILLENGLAS UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES BRILLENGLASDESIGNS | [2022/46] | English: | SPECTACLE LENS DESIGN, SPECTACLE LENS KIT, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A SPECTACLE LENS AND METHOD OF PROVIDING A SPECTACLE LENS DESIGN | [2022/46] | French: | DESIGN DE VERRE DE LUNETTES, KIT DE VERRE DE LUNETTES, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN VERRE DE LUNETTES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE D'UN DESIGN DE VERRE DE LUNETTES | [2022/46] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/43] | 12.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2020073147 (BAKARAJU RAVI CHANDRA [AU], et al) [X] 1-10,12-15 * figures 3I, 3J, 14A-C * * abstract * * paragraphs [0075] , [ 223] , [ 225] , [ 240] * [I] 11; | [XI]US2020326559 (HOSHI YUJI [JP]) [X] 1-10,12-15 * figures 1,2 * * abstract *[I] 11; | [XI]WO2021059887 (HOYA LENS THAILAND LTD [TH], et al) [X] 1-10,12-15 * figure 1 * * abstract * [I] 11 | by applicant | WO9966366 | US2003058407 | WO2005055891 | WO2006004440 | WO2006034652 | WO2007041796 | WO2007092853 | WO2009052570 | WO2009129528 | WO2010075319 | WO2010129465 | EP2115527 | EP2383603 | US2016054588 | WO2016168746 | US2017131567 | US2017276961 | WO2018026697 | US2019227342 | US2019235279 | WO2019152438 | WO2019166653 | WO2019166654 | WO2019166655 | WO2019166657 | WO2019166659 | EP3553594 | EP3561578 | WO2019206569 | WO2020014613 | WO2020113212 | WO2020180817 | - JUNG, S. K.LEE, J. H.KAKIZAKI, H.JEE, D., "Prevalence of myopia and its association with body stature and educational level in 19-year-old male conscripts in Seoul, South Korea", Invest Ophthalmol Vis Sci., (20120815), vol. 53, no. 9, pages 5579 - 83 | - HOLDEN, B. A.FRICKE, T. R.WILSON, D. A. et al., "Global Prevalence of Myopia and High Myopia and Temporal Trends from 2000 through 2050", Ophthalmology, (20160000), vol. 123, doi:10.1016/j.ophtha.2016.01.006, pages 1036 - 1042, XP029516956 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ophtha.2016.01.006 | - WONG T. Y.FERREIRA A.HUGHES R. et al., "Epidemiology and disease burden of pathologic myo-pia and myopic choroidal neovascularization: an evidence-based systematic review", Am J Ophthalmol, (20140000), vol. 157, pages 9 - 25 | - CHENG, X.XU, J.CHEHAB, K.EXFORD, J.BRENNAN, N., "Soft contact lenses with positive spherical aberration for myopia control", Optom Vis Sci, (20160000), vol. 93, pages 353 - 366 | - SANKARIDURG, P.BAKARAJU, R. C.NADUVILATH, T.CHEN, X.WENG, R.TILIA, D.XU, P.LI, W.CONRAD, F.SMITH, E. L. III, "Myopia control with novel central and peripheral plus contact lenses and extended depth of focus contact lenses: 2 year results from a randomised clinical trial", Ophthalmic Physiol Opt, vol. 39, (20190000), pages 294 - 307, URL: https://doi.org/10.1111/opo.12621 | - LAM, C. S. Y.TANG, W. C.TSE, D. Y. et al., "Defocus Incorporated Multiple Segments (DIMS) spectacle lenses slow myopia progression: a 2-year randomised clinical trial", Br J Ophthalmol, (20190000), vol. 0, pages 1 - 6 | - WERNER KOPPEN, "Konzeption und Entwicklung von Progressivglasern", Deutsche Optiker Zeitung DOZ 10/95, pages 42 - 46 | - WERNER KOPPEN, "Design and Development of Progressive Lenses", Deutsche Optiker Zeitung DOZ 10/95, pages 42 - 46 |