EP3907887 - DESATURATION CIRCUIT FOR MOSFET WITH HIGH NOISE IMMUNITY AND FAST DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Bo Vernon, 06066 / US | 02 /
LEE, Yongduk Vernon, 06066 / US | 03 /
WU, Xin Glastonbury, 06033 / US | [2021/45] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/45] | Application number, filing date | 21173097.3 | 10.05.2021 | [2021/45] | Priority number, date | US202063021818P | 08.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063021818 P | [2021/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3907887 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/082 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
H03K17/0822 (EP,US);
H02H1/0007 (US);
H03K5/01 (US);
H03K2005/00078 (US);
H03K2217/0027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] |
Former [2021/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTSÄTTIGUNGSSCHALTUNG FÜR MOSFET MIT HOHER RAUSCHIMMUNITÄT UND SCHNELLER DETEKTION | [2021/45] | English: | DESATURATION CIRCUIT FOR MOSFET WITH HIGH NOISE IMMUNITY AND FAST DETECTION | [2021/45] | French: | CIRCUIT DE DÉSATURATION D'UN MOSFET À HAUTE IMMUNITÉ AU BRUIT ET DÉTECTION RAPIDE | [2021/45] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 10.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0693826 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 58; figure 1 * * column 2, line 1 - line 12 *; | [XAI]JP2006295326 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,2,4-6 * paragraph [0012]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0038] * [A] 7-12 [I] 3; | [YA]US2014203843 (COTTELL ROBERT ANTHONY [GB]) [Y] 4-10 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0071] * [A] 1-3,11,12; | [XAI]US2014233278 (LI HUAQIANG [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027]; figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0034] * [A] 3-10 [I] 12; | [XAYI]US2016028219 (HABU YO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,11 * paragraph [0055]; figure 18 * * paragraph [0151] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0091] * [A] 3 [Y] 4-10 [I] 12; | [A]KR102026931B (KERI KOREA ELECTROTECHNOLOGY RES INST [KR]) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005]; figure 4 * |