EP4089746 - VERTICAL LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE STRUCTURE WITH METAL LAYER CAPABLE OF TESTING AND PROTECTING SIDEWALLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Excellence Opto. Inc. No. 2, Kedong 1st Road Chunan Town Hsinchu Science Park Chunan Town Miaoli County 35053 / TW | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Fu-Bang 35053 Miaoli County / TW | 02 /
YEN, Wei-Yu TAICHUNG CITY / TW | 03 /
TSAI, Tzeng-Guang 35053 Miaoli County / TW | 04 /
CHANG, Chih-Sung 407 TAICHUNG CITY / TW | 05 /
HUANG, Kuo-Hsin 35053 Miaoli County / TW | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 21173405.8 | 11.05.2021 | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4089746 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/38, H01L33/46, H01L33/44 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
H01L33/385 (EP);
H01L33/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERTIKALE LEUCHTDIODENSTRUKTUR MIT EINER ZUM TESTEN UND SCHÜTZEN VON SEITENWÄNDEN FÄHIGEN METALLSCHICHT | [2022/46] | English: | VERTICAL LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE STRUCTURE WITH METAL LAYER CAPABLE OF TESTING AND PROTECTING SIDEWALLS | [2022/46] | French: | STRUCTURE VERTICALE DE DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE COMPORTANT UNE COUCHE MÉTALLIQUE POUVANT TESTER ET PROTÉGER LES PAROIS LATÉRALES | [2022/46] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/43] | 09.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009014748 (HIRAO NAOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * paragraphs [0062] - [0085]; figure 1 * [I] 3,7-10; | [XI]DE102011010504 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraphs [0039] - [0071]; figure 1 * [I] 5,7-10; | [IA]US2014291612 (AIHARA NORIYUKI [JP]) [I] 1,4-10 * the whole document * * paragraph [0106] *[A] 2,3; | [I]US2016276538 (ZHAO WEI [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XAI]CN111864018 (YANGZHOU CHANGELIGHT CO LTD) [X] 1,4,9,10 * paragraphs [0049] - [0077]; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,3 [I] 5-8 |