EP3943789 - SAFETY CAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works, Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IAFRATE, Serge Illinois, 60025 / US | 02 /
COLLONGE, Yohan Illinois, 60025 / US | [2022/04] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 21173465.2 | 12.05.2021 | [2022/04] | Priority number, date | EP20200186785 | 20.07.2020 Original published format: EP 20186785 | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3943789 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16K15/14, F01P11/02 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
F01P11/0238 (EP);
F16K15/148 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] |
Former [2022/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSKAPPE | [2022/04] | English: | SAFETY CAP | [2022/04] | French: | CAPUCHON DE SÉCURITÉ | [2022/04] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 13.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2016056702 (COSM ENG CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0019] - [0073] * * figures 8-9 *; | [X]GB1534318 (GEN MOTORS FRANCE) [X] 1-8 * pages 1-2 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US3929158 (RODGERS ROBERT E) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 * * column 3, lines 10-22 * |