Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4066905 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202110360878 EP21173518 EP24167216 US202117302878 US202418636795



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024252853Global Dossier 01.08.2024A1
Priority number Date
US202117302878 14.05.2021
CN202110360878 02.04.2021
US202418636795 16.04.2024
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4368255Global Dossier 07.08.2024A3
EP4368255 15.05.2024A2
Priority number Date
CN202110360878 02.04.2021
EP21173518 12.05.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US11986684Global Dossier 21.05.2024B2
US2022314043 06.10.2022A1
Priority number Date
CN202110360878 02.04.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN115177883Global Dossier 14.10.2022A
Priority number Date
CN202110360878 02.04.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP4066905Global Dossier 08.05.2024C0
EP4066905Global Dossier 08.05.2024B1
EP4066905 05.10.2022A1
Priority number Date
CN202110360878 02.04.2021
TypeType Divisional application
 EP4368255