EP3913905 - PRINTED SHEET HANDLING SYSTEM CONTROLED AS FROM A DISCHARGE TIMING SIGNAL WAVEFORM DERIVED FROM PRINTOUT IMAGE INSPECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/47] | PRINTED SHEET HANDLING SYSTEM CONTROLED AS FROM A SIGNAL WAVEFORM DERIVED FROM PRINTOUT IMAGE INSPECTION | ||
[2023/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, FR, IT, SI | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 SHIMOMARUKO 3-CHOME OHTA-KU Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Hidekazu Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
FURUYA, Taichi Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
KAMADA, Naoki Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | [2021/47] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 21173832.3 | 14.05.2021 | [2021/47] | Priority number, date | JP20200088244 | 20.05.2020 Original published format: JP 2020088244 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3913905 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3913905 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, // B65H29/62, B65H43/04, G03G15/00 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
H04N1/00631 (EP);
G03G15/6538 (EP,US);
B65H33/04 (US);
H04N1/00005 (EP);
H04N1/00633 (EP);
B65H2220/01 (EP);
B65H2557/25 (US);
B65H2801/15 (EP);
B65H2801/27 (EP);
B65H29/62 (EP);
B65H43/04 (EP);
G03G15/5062 (EP);
H04N1/00015 (EP);
H04N1/00029 (EP);
H04N1/00074 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] |
Former [2021/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HANDHABUNGSSYSTEM FÜR BEDRUCKTE SEITEN, DAS DURCH EIN ZEITSIGNAL GESTEUERT WIRD, DESSEN WELLENFORM VON DER INSPEKTION DES DRUCKBILDES ABGELEITET IST | [2023/11] | English: | PRINTED SHEET HANDLING SYSTEM CONTROLED AS FROM A DISCHARGE TIMING SIGNAL WAVEFORM DERIVED FROM PRINTOUT IMAGE INSPECTION | [2023/11] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE FEUILLES CONTROLÉ PAR UN SIGNAL TEMPOREL DE SORTIE DONT LA FORME EST DEPENDENTE DU RESULTAT DE L'INSPECTION DE L'IMAGE IMPRIMEE | [2023/11] |
Former [2021/47] | HANDHABUNGSSYSTEM FÜR BEDRUCKTE SEITEN, DAS DURCH EIN SIGNAL GESTEUERT WIRD, DESSEN WELLENFORM VON DER INSPEKTION DES DRUCKBILDES ABGELEITET IST | ||
Former [2021/47] | PRINTED SHEET HANDLING SYSTEM CONTROLED AS FROM A SIGNAL WAVEFORM DERIVED FROM PRINTOUT IMAGE INSPECTION | ||
Former [2021/47] | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE FEUILLES CONTROLÉ PAR UN SIGNAL DONT LA FORME EST DEPENDENTE DU RESULTAT DE L'INSPECTION DE L'IMAGE IMPRIMEE | Examination procedure | 19.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 24.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2023 | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | ES | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | IT | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | MC | 10.05.2023 | NL | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | IE | 14.05.2023 | LU | 14.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | FR | 10.07.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
IE | 14.05.2023 | ||
LU | 14.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 14.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 14.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 14.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
PT | 11.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [T]EP2054778 (CANON KK [JP]) [T] 2,10 * figure 3 ** paragraphs [0036] - [0042] *; | [YDA]US2014042686 (KONISHI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [YD] 1-4,6-14 * abstract * * figures 4,20 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0074] , [0075] * [A] 5; | [IAY]JP2018126868 (KONICA MINOLTA INC) [I] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0012] , [0032] , [0061] * * claim 1 * [A] 5 [Y] 1-4,6-14 | Examination | US8905393 | EP2054778 | by applicant | US2014042686 |