EP3917160 - CAPTURING CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHTINIEMI, Arto Lempäälä / FI | 02 /
HEIKKINEN, Mikko Tampere / FI | 03 /
ERONEN, Antti Tampere / FI | 04 /
VILERMO, Miikka Siuro / FI | [2021/48] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab Salmisaarenaukio 1 P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2021/48] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 21173836.4 | 14.05.2021 | [2021/48] | Priority number, date | FI20200005538 | 27.05.2020 Original published format: FI 20205538 | [2021/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3917160 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04R3/00, H04R1/40 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
H04R3/005 (EP);
H04R1/406 (EP);
H04R2499/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] |
Former [2021/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERFASSEN VON INHALTEN | [2021/48] | English: | CAPTURING CONTENT | [2021/48] | French: | CAPTURE DE CONTENU | [2021/48] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 01.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008199025 (AMADA TADASHI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010128892 (CHEN SHAOHAI [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]WO2012083989 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US9432768 (O'NEILL JEFFREY CORNELIUS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3252775 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |