EP3955155 - SETTLEMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8562 / JP | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naito, Hidehiro Tokyo, 141-8562 / JP | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 21174074.1 | 17.05.2021 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | JP20200136567 | 13.08.2020 Original published format: JP 2020136567 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3955155 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10, G07G1/00 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
G06K7/10752 (EP);
G07G1/0018 (CN);
G07G1/12 (CN,US);
G06K7/10732 (EP);
G06K7/10861 (EP);
G06K7/1096 (EP);
G06K7/1417 (US);
G06Q20/208 (EP);
G07G1/0045 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] |
Former [2022/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABRECHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/07] | English: | SETTLEMENT DEVICE | [2022/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÈGLEMENT | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 02.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0421673 (NCR CO [US]); | [XI]EP2414989 (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [X]EP2414988 (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [A]EP3367293 (NCR CORP [US]) |