EP3916800 - POWER MOSFET WITH REDUCED CURRENT LEAKAGE AND METHOD OF FABRICATING THE POWER MOSFET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Pte Ltd. 28 Ang Mo Kio Industrial Park 2 Singapore 569508 / SG | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YONG, Yean Ching 550537 SINGAPORE / SG | [2021/48] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 21174461.0 | 18.05.2021 | [2021/48] | Priority number, date | US202063030642P | 27.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063030642 P | US202117236149 | 21.04.2021 Original published format: US202117236149 | [2021/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3916800 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/40, H01L29/66, H01L29/78 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
H01L29/7813 (EP,US);
H01L29/0603 (CN);
H01L29/0615 (US);
H01L21/477 (US);
H01L21/76224 (US);
H01L29/0684 (CN);
H01L29/407 (EP);
H01L29/518 (US);
H01L29/66477 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGS-MOSFET MIT NIEDRIGEM LECKSTROM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES LEISTUNGS-MOSFETS | [2021/48] | English: | POWER MOSFET WITH REDUCED CURRENT LEAKAGE AND METHOD OF FABRICATING THE POWER MOSFET | [2021/48] | French: | MOSFET DE PUISSANCE A COURANT DE FUITE REDUIT ET SON MÉTHODE DE FABRICATION | [2021/48] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 30.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012313225 (PFIRSCH FRANK [DE], et al) [A] 7-17* paragraph [0050]; figure 2B *; | [A]US2014273374 (YEDINAK JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-8,10,11,15-17 * paragraph [0044]; figure 9 *; | [A]US8871593 (SIEMIENIEC RALF [AT], et al) [A] 1-8,10,11,15-17 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 48; figure 1B * | by applicant | - LI et al., "Hydrogen outgassing induced liner/barrier reliability degradation in through silicon via's", Appl. Phys. Lett., (20140000), vol. 104, doi:10.1063/1.4871104, page 142906, XP012184093 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.4871104 | - HIRASHITA et al., "Thermal Desorption and Infrared Studies of Plasma-Enhanced Chemical Vapor Deposited SiO Films with Tetraethylorthosilicate", Japanese Journal of Applied Physics, (19930000), vol. 32, no. 4 |