Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3889546 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3889546



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 961
27.01.2025 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.01.2025 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.01.2025 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
02.07.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.07.2024 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
02.07.2024 Claims Search / examination 2
02.07.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.07.2024 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.03.2024 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
04.03.2024 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.02.2024 Examination started Search / examination 1
18.04.2023 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.04.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.04.2023 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
05.04.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.04.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.04.2022 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
06.04.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
06.04.2022 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
06.04.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.10.2021 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
08.09.2021 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
26.08.2021 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
24.08.2021 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.08.2021 European search opinion Search / examination 10
24.08.2021 European search report Search / examination 2
24.08.2021 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
18.08.2021 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
18.05.2021 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.05.2021 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
18.05.2021 Claims Search / examination 2
18.05.2021 Description Search / examination 105
18.05.2021 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
18.05.2021 Drawings Search / examination 53
18.05.2021 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
18.05.2021 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
14.10.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 115
14.10.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 54
14.10.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 100
14.10.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 171
14.10.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 180
14.10.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 112