EP3913252 - DEVICE FOR CLAMPING A CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Industrielle des Chauffe-Eau 2 Rue du Docteur Hurst 68300 Saint-Louis / FR | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURDIN, Yvan 90110 SAINT-GERMAIN-LE-CHATELET / FR | 02 /
ANTOINE, Florian 90000 BELFORT / FR | [2021/47] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21174683.9 | 19.05.2021 | [2021/47] | Priority number, date | FR20200005110 | 19.05.2020 Original published format: FR 2005110 | [2021/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3913252 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16G11/10 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
F16G11/101 (EP);
F24H9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] |
Former [2021/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEMMVORRICHTUNG FÜR KABEL | [2021/47] | English: | DEVICE FOR CLAMPING A CABLE | [2021/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE DE CABLE | [2021/47] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 18.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US422720 ; | [XI]US2884673 (ELLSWORTH JOSEPH P); | [XAI]FR2511813 (DERVAUX ETS [FR]); | [XI]US5392496 (JOHNSON EMERIC W [CA]) |