EP3919578 - PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE SHEET FOR SEMICONDUCTOR PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Shunpei Ibaraki-shi, 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
KONO, Hiroki Ibaraki-shi, 567-8680 / JP | 03 /
UENO, Taiki Ibaraki-shi, 567-8680 / JP | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 21175263.9 | 21.05.2021 | [2021/49] | Priority number, date | JP20200096050 | 02.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020096050 | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919578 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/38, C09J7/29 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
C09J7/38 (EP);
C09J7/20 (CN,KR);
C09J7/29 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08L33/04 (KR);
C09J133/14 (CN);
C09J7/30 (KR);
C09J7/385 (EP,CN,US);
H01L21/6835 (CN);
H01L21/6836 (KR);
B32B2307/51 (US);
B32B2307/734 (US);
B32B2457/14 (US);
C09J2203/326 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2301/122 (CN);
C09J2301/302 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] |
Former [2021/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKEMPFINDLICHE KLEBEFOLIE FÜR DIE HALBLEITERVERARBEITUNG | [2021/49] | English: | PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE SHEET FOR SEMICONDUCTOR PROCESSING | [2021/49] | French: | FEUILLE ADHÉSIVE SENSIBLE À LA PRESSION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE SEMI-CONDUCTEURS | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 02.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005031861 (MATSUMURA TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [X]WO2011078193 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]JP2012209429 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [X]JP2016121231 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2005236032 | JP5390740B | JP2020096050 |