EP4092062 - WATER-BASED PROTECTIVE COATINGS HAVING IMPROVED ADHESION TO LACQUERED METAL SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brüggemann, Simon 20251 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Hanhörster, Thomas 25421 Pinneberg / DE | 03 /
Janke, Doreen 25486 Alveslohe / DE | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/47] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 21175303.3 | 21.05.2021 | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4092062 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/00, C08G18/08, C08G18/28, C08G18/38, C08G18/58, C08G18/67, C08G18/68, C08G18/76, C08G18/80, C08L75/04, C09D175/04, C09J175/04, C08K3/013, C08K3/36, C08G18/10, C09D133/08, C09J133/08 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
C08G18/7671 (EP);
C08G18/003 (EP);
C08G18/0866 (EP);
C08G18/10 (EP);
C08G18/288 (EP);
C08G18/289 (EP);
C08G18/3876 (EP);
C08G18/58 (EP);
C08G18/67 (EP);
C08G18/68 (EP);
C08G18/809 (EP);
C08L75/04 (EP);
C09D133/08 (EP);
C09D175/04 (EP);
C09J175/04 (EP);
C08K3/34 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L75/04, C08G18/003 (EP);
C08L75/04, C08G18/0866 (EP);
C08L75/04, C08G18/58 (EP);
C08L75/04, C08G18/68 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGEN AUF WASSERBASIS MIT VERBESSERTER HAFTUNG AUF LACKIERTEN METALLSUBSTRATEN | [2022/47] | English: | WATER-BASED PROTECTIVE COATINGS HAVING IMPROVED ADHESION TO LACQUERED METAL SUBSTRATES | [2022/47] | French: | REVÊTEMENTS PROTECTEURS À BASE D'EAU AYANT UNE ADHÉRENCE AMÉLIORÉE AUX SUBSTRATS MÉTALLIQUES LAQUÉS | [2022/47] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/46] | 29.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2020071512 (BUCHHOLZ ANDRÉ [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16* pages 13-14, paragraphs 224-228; examples 2; 6-23; tables 6-7 *; | [XY]WO2020089018 (COVESTRO DEUTSCHLAND AG [DE]) [X] 1-16 * page 20, lines 24-25; page 46, lines 1-15; page 47, lines 1-21;; page 11;13;34, lines 24-34;33-34;16-18 - pages 44-45; examples 1,3 * [Y] 1-16 | by applicant | EP0490191 | EP0620243 | DE19801892 | WO0248228 | US2005014881 |