EP3913563 - METHOD OF PROVIDING A SHARED LOCATION-SPECIFIC SESSION FOR A PLURALITY OF USER DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soho Technologies Ltd 78 York Street London Greater London W1H 1DP / GB | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUTLER, Carlos London, W1H 1DP / GB | [2021/47] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Maximilian Henry, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 21175452.8 | 21.05.2021 | [2021/47] | Priority number, date | GB20200007730 | 22.05.2020 Original published format: GB 202007730 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3913563 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/06, G06Q50/12, G06Q20/32 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
G06Q50/12 (EP,GB);
G06Q30/0633 (EP,GB);
G06Q20/3224 (EP);
G06Q20/327 (EP);
G06Q20/384 (EP);
G06Q20/4015 (EP);
G06Q20/405 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER GEMEINSAMEN STANDORTSPEZIFISCHEN SITZUNG FÜR MEHRERE BENUTZERGERÄTE | [2021/47] | English: | METHOD OF PROVIDING A SHARED LOCATION-SPECIFIC SESSION FOR A PLURALITY OF USER DEVICES | [2021/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FOURNIR UNE SESSION PARTAGÉE SPÉCIFIQUE À UN EMPLACEMENT POUR UNE PLURALITÉ DE DISPOSITIFS D'UTILISATEUR | [2021/47] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/44] | 16.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013191229 (RODGERS DANIEL MICHAEL [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0060] - [0067] - [0076] - [0125] *; | [I]CN107886449 (YAMI TECH CHENGDU CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0036] - [0067] - [0079] - [0085] - [0100] *; | [XI]US2019130504 (CHRISTENSEN COY A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10,12-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] - [0032] - [0042] - [0072] * [I] 5-7,11 |