EP3939640 - APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place 2013 Auckland / NZ | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIGHTINGALE, Christopher, Earl 2013 Auckland / NZ | 02 /
KURIGER, Donald, Roy 2013 Auckland / NZ | [2022/03] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 21175518.6 | 12.08.2011 | [2022/03] | Priority number, date | US201037336110P | 13.08.2010 Original published format: US 37336110 P | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3939640 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3939640 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00, A61B5/00, A61M16/10, A61M16/16 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
A61M16/0066 (EP,US);
A61M16/00 (GB);
A61B5/4809 (EP,US);
A61M16/0069 (EP,US);
A61M16/024 (EP);
A61M16/06 (US);
A61M16/109 (EP,US);
A61M16/16 (EP,US);
A61M16/1085 (EP);
A61M16/1095 (EP);
A61M2016/0015 (EP);
A61M2016/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2016/003 (EP);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3334 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61M2230/42, A61M2230/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] |
Former [2022/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GERÄT | [2022/03] | English: | APPARATUS | [2022/03] | French: | APPAREIL | [2022/03] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 26.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11816154.6 / EP2603267 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0788805 (DEVILBISS HEALTH CARE INC [US]); | [A]WO2005089641 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al); | [A]US2006102179 (RAPOPORT DAVID M [US], et al); | [A]WO2006102708 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al); | [A]US2007175473 (LEWIS CHARLES A [US], et al); | [A]WO2008028248 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al); | [A]WO2008092021 (CS MEDICAL INC [US]); | [A]WO2009145646 (FISHER & PAYKEL HEALTHCARE LTD [NZ], et al); | [A]WO2009146484 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) | by applicant | US6988994 | US2008092894 | EP20110816154 |