EP3919505 - USES OF CAS9-NUCLEIC ACID COMPLEXES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emory University Office of Technology Transfer 1599 Clifton Road NE, 4th Floor Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEISS, David S. Decatur, GA 30032 / US | 02 /
GRAKOUI, Arash Decatur, GA 30033 / US | 03 /
SAMPSON, Timothy Atlanta, GA 30329 / US | 04 /
PRICE, Aryn Alaine Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | Lau, Sarah Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 21175562.4 | 15.01.2014 | [2021/49] | Priority number, date | US201361753046P | 16.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361753046 P | US201361905368P | 18.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361905368 P | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919505 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3919505 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/195, C12N9/22, C12N15/113, C12N15/90 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
C07K14/195 (EP,US);
C12N9/16 (US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
C12N15/1131 (EP);
C12N15/8213 (EP,US);
C12N15/8216 (EP,US);
C12N15/8218 (EP,US);
C12N15/902 (EP,US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
C12Y301/21004 (EP,US);
A61K2035/11 (EP);
A61K2039/5156 (EP,US);
A61K2039/523 (EP);
C07K2319/42 (EP,US);
C07K2319/85 (EP,US);
C12N2310/20 (EP);
C12N2800/22 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] |
Former [2021/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNGEN VON CAS9-NUKLEINSÄUREKOMPLEXEN | [2021/49] | English: | USES OF CAS9-NUCLEIC ACID COMPLEXES | [2021/49] | French: | UTILISATIONS DES COMPLEXES D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE CAS9 | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 06.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14740738.1 / EP2946015 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | MC | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | Cited in | by applicant | EP0122791 | US4536475 | US4693977 | US4886937 | US4959317 | US5015580 | US5110732 | US5302523 | US5459252 | US5464765 | US5501967 | US5508184 | US5527695 | US5538880 | US5550318 | US5563055 | US5591616 | US5618682 | US5674713 | US5693512 | US5824877 | US5837848 | US5976796 | US5981840 | US6074859 | US6160208 | US6384301 | US6399861 | US6403865 | WO2006073727 | US2006200878 | WO2007025097 |