EP4094858 - DEVICE FOR STRAIGHTENING METAL PROFILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Creametal AG Bielstrasse 14 3273 Kappelen / CH | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Mario 3203 Mühleberg / CH | 02 /
Gasser, Reto 3253 Schnottwil / CH | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21176277.8 | 27.05.2021 | [2022/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4094858 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B21D3/05, B21D43/09 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
B21D3/05 (EP);
B21D43/09 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] |
Former [2022/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM RICHTEN VON METALLPROFILEN | [2022/48] | English: | DEVICE FOR STRAIGHTENING METAL PROFILES | [2022/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DRESSAGE DE PROFILÉS MÉTALLIQUES | [2022/48] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 25.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1243324 (O S C A M) [A] 1-8 * page 2, column 2, paragraph 5; figure 7 *; | [A]EP0423592 (PIEGATRICI MACCH ELETTR [IT]) [A] 1-8 * column 6, lines 28-31; figure - *; | [AD]DE19606875 (WITELS APP MASCH ALBERT GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]CN210995901U (GUANGDONG CHANGHUA HAILI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * Riemengetriebe 25; figure 1 *; | [XA]CN211888493U (HANGZHOU HUALONG WEAVING MACHINE CO LTD) [X] 1-4,7,8 * abstract; figure - * [A] 5,6 | by applicant | DE19606875 |