EP3991805 - FOAM SUPPLY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): RS | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neumaerker, Harald Strohbogasse 1 1210 Wien / AT | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 21176801.5 | 31.05.2021 | [2022/18] | Priority number, date | EP20200204565 | 29.10.2020 Original published format: EP 20204565 | [2022/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3991805 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3991805 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A62C31/12, B05B7/00, A62C3/16, A62C5/02, B65D83/14 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
A62C5/022 (EP);
A62C31/12 (EP);
A62C5/024 (EP);
B05B7/005 (EP);
B05B7/0425 (EP);
B05B1/3415 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | SCHAUMZUFUHREINRICHTUNG | [2022/18] | English: | FOAM SUPPLY DEVICE | [2022/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN MOUSSE | [2022/18] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 03.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 10.04.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 10.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]DE102006035349 (NEUMAERKER HARALD [AT]); | [A]US8360339 (HENRY DARREN SEAN [US]) | by applicant | DE102006035349 |