EP3929342 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FASTENING SYSTEM FOR A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/52] | FASTENING SYSTEM FOR A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | ||
[2024/20] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Straße 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Radusin, Darko 33803 Steinhagen / DE | 02 /
Höwelhans, Andreas 33415 Verl / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 21177123.3 | 01.06.2021 | [2021/52] | Priority number, date | DE202010116584 | 24.06.2020 Original published format: DE102020116584 | [2021/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3929342 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3929342 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/12, F16B25/00, F16B37/02, F16B37/00, // B21D39/03, F16B5/04 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
D06F39/12 (EP);
B21D39/031 (EP);
F16B25/0021 (EP);
F16B37/005 (EP);
F16B37/02 (EP);
F16B5/045 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | D06F39/12, // B21D39/03, F16B5/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] |
Former [2021/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEMS FÜR EIN HAUSHALTSGERÄT | [2024/20] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FASTENING SYSTEM FOR A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE | [2024/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN SYSTÈME DE FIXATION POUR UN APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER | [2024/20] |
Former [2021/52] | BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN HAUSHALTSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2021/52] | FASTENING SYSTEM FOR A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | ||
Former [2021/52] | SYSTÈME DE FIXATION POUR UN APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Examination procedure | 29.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 29.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP0588100 (MIELE & CIE [DE]); | [XA]KR101012361B ; | [Y]DE102007009823 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [XAYI]DE202016001920U (ELECTROLUX APPLIANCES AB [SE]) |