EP3892905 - COUPLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georg Fischer WAGA N.V. Lange Veenteweg 19 8161 PA Epe / NL | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hulsebos, Michel Paul 7451 MN Holten / NL | 02 /
van der Molen, Arjen Cornelis 8181 PN Heerde / NL | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Fenner, Seraina Georg Fischer AG Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 21177146.4 | 09.11.2018 | [2021/41] | Priority number, date | NL20172019920 | 16.11.2017 Original published format: NL 2019920 | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3892905 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3892905 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/04, F16L21/08, B23H9/14, B23H1/02 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
B23H9/14 (EP,US);
F16L21/04 (EP,US);
F16L21/08 (EP,US);
B23H1/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] |
Former [2021/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOPPLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/41] | English: | COUPLING DEVICE | [2021/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUPLAGE | [2021/41] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 15.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18205289.4 / EP3486542 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | FI | 04.01.2023 | HR | 04.01.2023 | LT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | MC | 04.01.2023 | PL | 04.01.2023 | RO | 04.01.2023 | RS | 04.01.2023 | SI | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | GR | 05.04.2023 | IS | 04.05.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | FI | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 04.01.2023 | |
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 04.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2646939 (HAWLE & CO E) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * pages 5,6 *; | [AD]EP0974780 (FISCHER GEORG WAGA NV [NL]) [AD] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] *; | [AD]EP1138999 (FISCHER GEORG WAGA NV [NL]) [AD] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] *; | [A]WO2009157766 (FISCHER GEORG WAGA NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 21 * * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 20 *; | [AD]WO2015177259 (FISCHER GEORG WAGA NV [NL]) [AD] 1,2* abstract *; | [A]NL2013426 (DYKA B V [NL]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 21, line 34 - page 22, line 15; figures 3A-3C * | by applicant | EP0974780 | EP1138999 | WO2007055576 | WO2010114366 | WO2014090667 | WO2015177259 |