EP3919842 - STRUCTURE FOR STORING SNOW AND METHOD FOR MOUNTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Serge Ferrari SAS Zone Industrielle de la Tour du Pin 38110 Saint Jean de Soudain / FR | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RENARD, Pierre 38480 SAINT ANDRE LE GAZ / FR | 02 /
BARIL, Sébastien 73420 MERY / FR | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 21177515.0 | 03.06.2021 | [2021/49] | Priority number, date | FR20200005828 | 04.06.2020 Original published format: FR 2005828 | [2021/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919842 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F25C5/18, A63C19/12, E01C13/12 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
F25C5/18 (EP);
A63C19/10 (EP);
A63C19/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] |
Former [2021/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEESPEICHERSTRUKTUR UND IHR MONTAGEVERFAHREN | [2021/49] | English: | STRUCTURE FOR STORING SNOW AND METHOD FOR MOUNTING SAME | [2021/49] | French: | STRUCTURE DE STOCKAGE DE NEIGE ET SON PROCEDE DE MONTAGE | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 28.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0201987 (BROCHU ADRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 7-9 *; | [YA]JPH08302609 (MITSUI SEKIKA SANSHI KK, et al) [Y] 1-9 * figures 1-3 * [A] 10-15; | [YA]JPH0994318 (SANKO SHOJI KK, et al) [Y] 1-9 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0023] * [A] 10-15; | [A]EP3535035 (SNOW SECURE OY [FI]) [A] 1-15* figures 1-4 * |