EP3971978 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC SYSTEM INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Yongkyu 16677 Suwon-si / KR | 02 /
KIM, Youngmok 16677 Suwon-si / KR | 03 /
JEON, Changmin 16677 Suwon-si / KR | 04 /
JEONG, Yongsang 16677 Suwon-si / KR | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/12] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 21177562.2 | 03.06.2021 | [2022/12] | Priority number, date | KR20200120039 | 17.09.2020 Original published format: KR 20200120039 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3971978 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3971978 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/11573, G11C16/06, H01L21/8234, H01L25/065, H01L25/18, // H01L27/11582 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
H01L21/823462 (EP);
H10B43/40 (EP,KR,US);
G11C16/08 (EP);
H01L21/823456 (EP);
H01L24/05 (KR);
H01L24/08 (US);
H01L24/80 (US);
H01L25/0657 (EP,KR,US);
H01L25/18 (EP,US);
H01L25/50 (US);
H01L27/088 (EP,KR);
H10B41/27 (KR,US);
H10B41/35 (KR);
H10B41/41 (KR,US);
H10B41/50 (KR);
H10B43/27 (EP,KR,US);
H10B43/35 (KR);
H10B43/50 (KR);
G11C16/0483 (EP);
H01L2224/08145 (US);
H01L2224/80895 (US);
H01L2224/80896 (US);
H01L2225/06527 (EP);
H01L2225/06541 (EP);
H01L2225/06568 (EP);
H01L2225/06575 (EP);
H01L2924/1431 (US);
H01L2924/14511 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND ELEKTRONISCHES SYSTEM DAMIT | [2022/12] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC SYSTEM INCLUDING THE SAME | [2022/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET SYSTÈME ÉLECTRONIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 11.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T]US2007115725 (PHAM TUAN [US], et al) [T] 4-10* paragraphs [0004] - [0014]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2010207204 (KIM YOUNG-MOK [KR], et al) [Y] 4-10 * paragraphs [0030] - [0059] - [0074] , [0097] - [0110]; figures 1-3,6,25-36 *; | [XYI]US2019267088 (JEON CHANG HOON [KR], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0051] - [0060]; figures 10-12 * [Y] 4-10 [I] 2,12,13; | [IY]US2020185400 (PARK JOO WON [KR], et al) [I] 1,2,12,13 * paragraphs [0015] - [0019] - [0051]; figure 1 * [Y] 4-10 |