EP4099041 - SENSOR FOR MEASURING A MAGNETIC FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Humboldt-Universität zu Berlin Unter den Linden 6 10099 Berlin / DE | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRÖDER, Tim 12051 Berlin / DE | 02 /
PERONA MARTINEZ, Felipe 12359 Berlin / DE | 03 /
BOPP, Julian 12529 Berlin / DE | 04 /
KLEINERT, Moritz 13187 Berlin / DE | 05 /
CONRADI, Hauke 10555 Berlin / DE | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Uwe Patentanwalt Moritzstraße 22 13597 Berlin / DE | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21177745.3 | 04.06.2021 | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4099041 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/26, G01R33/32, // G01R33/00, G01R33/032 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
G01R33/26 (EP);
G01R33/032 (EP,US);
G01R33/0094 (EP);
G01R33/0206 (US);
G01R33/323 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/49] | G01R33/26, G01R33/32, // G01R33/032 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] |
Former [2022/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSOR ZUR MESSUNG EINES MAGNETFELDES | [2022/49] | English: | SENSOR FOR MEASURING A MAGNETIC FIELD | [2022/49] | French: | CAPTEUR POUR MESURER UN CHAMP MAGNÉTIQUE | [2022/49] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 02.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016174867 (HATANO YUJI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2018128543 (UNIV GRONINGEN [NL], et al); |