EP3929709 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2024 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-City Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Jaeuk Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kim, Yun-Ho Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Chul Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Na, Hye-Seok Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Lee, Soojung Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2021/52] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Berliner Freiheit 2 10785 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 21177764.4 | 04.06.2021 | [2021/52] | Priority number, date | KR20200075877 | 22.06.2020 Original published format: KR 20200075877 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3929709 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/044 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
G06F3/0412 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F3/0443 (US);
G06F3/04164 (CN);
G06F3/0418 (EP);
G06F3/044 (KR);
G06F3/0446 (CN,US);
G06F3/0448 (EP);
H10H29/142 (CN);
H10K59/40 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] |
Former [2021/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/52] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2021/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2021/52] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 28.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015242010 (COK RONALD STEVEN [US]); | [A]EP3276470 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [A]EP3336667 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [XI]GB2559571 (SOLOMON SYSTECH LTD [CN]); | [A]EP3657308 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) | Examination | EP3291072 |