EP4020155 - MANAGING WRITE REMOVAL FOR SOLID-STATE DRIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Red Hat, Inc. 100 East Davie Street Raleigh, NC 27601 / US | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WASSERMAN, Orit Raleigh, 27601 / US | 02 /
BENHANOKH, Gabriel Zvi Raleigh, 27601 / US | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/26] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21177842.8 | 04.06.2021 | [2022/26] | Priority number, date | US202017130163 | 22.12.2020 Original published format: US202017130163 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4020155 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06, G06F9/455 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
G06F3/0652 (EP,CN);
G06F3/0616 (EP,CN);
G06F3/0659 (US);
G06F3/0626 (US);
G06F3/064 (CN);
G06F3/0644 (EP);
G06F3/067 (US);
G06F3/0679 (EP,US);
G06F9/4411 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/05] |
Former [2022/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG DER SCHREIBENTFERNUNG FÜR FESTKÖRPERLAUFWERKE | [2022/26] | English: | MANAGING WRITE REMOVAL FOR SOLID-STATE DRIVES | [2022/26] | French: | GESTION D'ÉLIMINATION D'ÉCRITURE POUR DISQUES À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS | [2022/26] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/05] | 28.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2018307537 (CHEN HUAMIN [US], et al); | [A]US2020150865 (KRISHNAMURTHY PRADEEP [IN]) |