EP4102025 - SELF-LOCKING THREADED CONNECTION PARTIALLY IN NON-LOCKING ENGAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2024 | New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vallourec Oil and Gas France 54 rue Anatole France 59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELBOSCO, Thimothé 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | 02 /
OTT, Wesley 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | 03 /
GRANGER, Scott 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Mbacke, Mactar, et al Vallourec Tubes DPI 12 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21178068.9 | 07.06.2021 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4102025 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4102025 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/042 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
E21B17/0423 (EP);
F16L15/002 (US);
F16L15/06 (US);
E21B17/043 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] |
Former [2022/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SELBSTSICHERNDE GEWINDEVERBINDUNG, TEILWEISE IN NICHT SICHERNDEM EINGRIFF | [2022/50] | English: | SELF-LOCKING THREADED CONNECTION PARTIALLY IN NON-LOCKING ENGAGEMENT | [2022/50] | French: | CONNEXION FILETÉE AUTOBLOQUANTE PARTIELLEMENT DANS UN ENCLENCHEMENT SANS BLOCAGE | [2022/50] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2021 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 05.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.03.2024
08.03.2024
ADMISSIBLE Hydril Company 2200 West Loop South, Suite 800 Houston, TX 77027 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2024/16] |
Former [2024/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.03.2024
Hydril Company 2200 West Loop South, Suite 800 Houston, TX 77027 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | 22.03.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.07.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | IE | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4345119 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]); | [A]US2016186899 (BESSE JEAN-GUILLAUME [US]); | [A]WO2019076622 (VALLOUREC OIL & GAS FRANCE [FR], et al) | Opposition | GB1587836 | DE4345119 | US2006145477 | US2007132239 | WO2007149673 | WO2010069491 | WO2014044773 | WO2016097049 | US2016186899 | EP3473798 | EP3514431 | EP3514432 | WO2020075365 | WO2021044862 | US2021246737 | EP4027044 |