EP3929685 - INDUSTRIAL AUTOMATION HMI PROGRAM FILE GENERATION FROM COMPUTER-AIDED DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAYYARRODSARI, Bijan Mayfield Heights, 44124 / US | 02 /
GOVINDARAJ, Subbian Mayfield Heights, 44124 / US | 03 /
VASKO, David A. Mayfield Heights, 44124 / US | 04 /
WEINHOFER, Juergen Mayfield Heights, 44124 / US | 05 /
ELLIS, Andrew James Mayfield Heights, 44124 / US | 06 /
LIN, Ka-Hing Mayfield Heights, 44124 / US | 07 /
PANTALEANO, Michael Mayfield Heights, 44124 / US | 08 /
CHAND, Sujeet Mayfield Heights, 44124 / US | 09 /
CRUM, Kyle A. Mayfield Heights, 44124 / US | [2021/52] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 21178229.7 | 08.06.2021 | [2021/52] | Priority number, date | US202016907464 | 22.06.2020 Original published format: US202016907464 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3929685 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, G06K9/00 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
G05B23/0216 (EP);
G05B19/41865 (CN);
G05B19/41885 (EP,US);
G05B19/4183 (US);
G05B19/4188 (US);
G06F30/12 (US);
G06F8/34 (EP);
G06F8/36 (EP);
G06F8/38 (EP);
G06Q10/06393 (US);
G05B19/0426 (EP);
G05B2219/13144 (US);
G05B2219/23012 (EP);
G05B2219/32252 (CN);
G06F9/453 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] |
Former [2021/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG EINER HMI-PROGRAMMDATEI IN INDUSTRIELLER AUTOMATISIERUNG DURCH COMPUTERGESTÜTZTES KONSTRUIEREN | [2021/52] | English: | INDUSTRIAL AUTOMATION HMI PROGRAM FILE GENERATION FROM COMPUTER-AIDED DESIGN | [2021/52] | French: | GÉNÉRATION DE FICHIERS DE PROGRAMME IHM D'AUTOMATISATION INDUSTRIELLE À PARTIR DE LA CONCEPTION ASSISTÉE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2021/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 27.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1638028 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,9-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0013] - [0021] - [0025]; figure 1 * [Y] 6-8,12; | [XY]US2009282067 (BENDIGERI VENKATESH [IN], et al) [X] 1-5,9-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 27] - [0044] * [Y] 6-8,12; | [Y]EP2728427 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) [Y] 6-8,12* paragraphs [0045] , [0 53] , [0 54] *; | [XY]US2019086902 (GANACHARI MAHANTESH [IN]) [X] 1-5,9-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0005] - [0011] - [0 31] , [0 56] , [0 67]; figure 5 * [Y] 6-8,12; | [XY]US2020005094 (SINHA BHASKAR [IN], et al) [X] 1-5,9-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0035] - [0056] - [0058]; figure 3 * [Y] 6-8,12 |