EP3866044 - ROAD TEST METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTONOMOUS DRIVING VEHICLE, DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IT, SI | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus No. 10 Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/21] |
Former [2021/33] | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus No.10 Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Jun Beijing, China / CN | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/21] |
Former [2021/33] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 21178545.6 | 09.06.2021 | [2021/33] | Priority number, date | CN202011436678 | 10.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011436678 | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3866044 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3866044 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3866044 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F30/15, G01M17/007 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
G01M17/06 (EP);
G01M17/007 (EP,CN,KR);
B60W60/0011 (EP,KR,US);
B60W40/02 (EP,KR);
B60W50/04 (EP);
B60W50/045 (EP);
G08G1/0145 (US);
G08G1/07 (US);
G08G1/096716 (EP);
G08G1/096741 (EP);
G08G1/096775 (EP);
G08G1/096783 (EP);
G08G1/096791 (EP);
B60W2050/0005 (EP,KR);
B60W2552/00 (EP);
B60W2554/4049 (EP,US);
B60W2554/406 (EP);
B60W2554/80 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/33] | G06F30/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR STRASSENTEST FÜR AUTONOM FAHRENDE FAHRZEUGE, VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/33] | English: | ROAD TEST METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTONOMOUS DRIVING VEHICLE, DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/33] | French: | MÉTHODE ET APPAREIL DE TEST ROUTIER POUR VÉHICULE À CONDUITE AUTONOME, DISPOSITIF ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2021/33] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 20.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2023 | CZ | 24.05.2023 | DK | 24.05.2023 | EE | 24.05.2023 | ES | 24.05.2023 | FI | 24.05.2023 | HR | 24.05.2023 | IT | 24.05.2023 | LT | 24.05.2023 | LV | 24.05.2023 | MC | 24.05.2023 | NL | 24.05.2023 | PL | 24.05.2023 | RO | 24.05.2023 | RS | 24.05.2023 | SE | 24.05.2023 | SI | 24.05.2023 | SK | 24.05.2023 | SM | 24.05.2023 | IE | 09.06.2023 | LU | 09.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | NO | 24.08.2023 | GR | 25.08.2023 | IS | 24.09.2023 | PT | 25.09.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
IE | 09.06.2023 | ||
LU | 09.06.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
LU | 09.06.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 24.05.2023 | |
PT | 25.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]CN107782564 (QINGDAO VEHICLE INTELLIGENCE PIONEERS INC) [X] 1-6,11-17 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0248] - paragraph [0285] * [Y] 7,8 [I] 9,10; | [Y]US2019145860 (PHILLIPS MATTHEW E [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0019] *; | [A]CN111765903 (BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCI & TEC) [A] 1-17* paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0016] * |